MN SF2759 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 308 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 308 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
State building code municipal enforcement provisions modifications
Title
State building code municipal enforcement provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Mee Moua [D] | Sen. Steven Murphy [D] | Sen. Katie Sieben [D] |
Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 308 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-12 | Governor's action Approval 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: Senate concurred and repassed bill | |
2010-05-05 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-05-03 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-03 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-03 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-03 | House: Reported to the House | |
2010-05-03 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-06 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2945 | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Author added Sieben | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Referred to Business, Industry and Jobs |