MN SF2697 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3095
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3095
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste management provisions modification; organized collection agreement joint liability limitation
Title
Solid waste management provisions modification; organized collection agreement joint liability limitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3095 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3095 (Similar To) 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 177