MN HF3095 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Waste management provisions modified.
Title
Waste management provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 108 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 108 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 177 | |
2018-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2697 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2697, now on General Orders |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill was passed vote: 108-18 |
2018-04-12 | House | Third reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendments offered |
2018-04-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 12, 2018. |
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2697 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3095