MN SF2685 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Positive support strategies training rule child care providers exemption
Title
Positive support strategies training rule child care providers exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 163 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action No signature | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-0 |
2018-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3253 |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3253 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Author added Pugh.