MN SF2682 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fillmore county veterans cemetery funding
Title
Fillmore county veterans cemetery funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-05-10 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-05-06 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Referred to Finance |