MN SF2661 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan agricultural preserves expiration modification; Gateway trail predesign and design bond issue and appropriation
Title
Metropolitan agricultural preserves expiration modification; Gateway trail predesign and design bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3127 (Similar To) 2018-03-16 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division