MN SF2638 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Real estate title provisions modifications
Title
Real estate title provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2841 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2841 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 37