MN SF2470 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Medical cannabis (marijuana) registry program establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical cannabis (marijuana) registry program establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-16 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 89 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 86 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 28 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 47 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 47 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 48 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 32 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 38 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 46 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 48 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 52 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 71 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 74 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 87 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 76 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-09 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 54 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-29 Secretary of State, Filed
2014-05-29 Governor approval
2014-05-29 Secretary of State Chapter 311
2014-05-29 Governor's action Approval
2014-05-17 Presented to Governor
2014-05-16HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 89-40
2014-05-16HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2014-05-16HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2014-05-16HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2014-05-16HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2014-05-16SenateHouse adopted SCC report and repassed bill
2014-05-16SenateThird reading vote: 46-16
2014-05-16SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2014-05-16SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2014-05-13SenateHouse conferees Melin; Murphy, E.; Hamilton
2014-05-13SenateSenate conferees Dibble; Lourey; Petersen, B.
2014-05-13SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2014-05-13SenateReturned from House with amendment
2014-05-13HouseHouse conferees Melin; Murphy, E.; Hamilton
2014-05-13HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
2014-05-13HouseSenate conferees Dibble; Lourey; Petersen, B.
2014-05-13HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2014-05-09HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 86-39
2014-05-09HouseThird reading as amended
2014-05-09HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken multiple points of order
2014-05-09HouseAmended
2014-05-08SenateChief author added Dibble
2014-05-08SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Tomassoni
2014-05-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 9, 2014
2014-05-07HouseSecond reading
2014-05-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2014-05-05HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2014-05-01HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Rules and Legislative Administration
2014-04-25HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Education Policy
2014-04-25HouseReceived from Senate
2014-04-24SenateThird reading Passed vote: 59-1
2014-04-24SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2014-03-24SenateSecond reading
2014-03-24SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2014-03-10SenateReferred to Education
2014-03-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF2470&ssn=0&y=2013
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2470&version=0&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2470&version=1&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2470&version=2&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2470&version=3&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1090
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1091
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1092
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1093
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1094
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1095
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1096
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1097
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1098
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1099
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1100
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1101
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1102
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1103
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1104
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1105
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1106
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=SF2470&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1182

Bill Comments

feedback