MN SF2466 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans special motor vehicle license plates for Korean defense service medal recipients
Title
Veterans special motor vehicle license plates for Korean defense service medal recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Authors added Fobbe; Clark; Erickson Ropes | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Agriculture and Veterans |