MN SF2449 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individuals with intellectual disabilities obesity study and recommendations commissioner of health requirement and appropriation
Title
Individuals with intellectual disabilities obesity study and recommendations commissioner of health requirement and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Kent [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2589 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy