MN SF2422 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Frentz
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motorboat with zero net greenhouse gas emissions preference for purchase establishment
Title
Motorboat with zero net greenhouse gas emissions preference for purchase establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2538 (Similar To) 2021-04-17 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections