MN SF2378 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substance use disorder system continuum of treatment reform
Title
Substance use disorder system continuum of treatment reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2016-05-31 | Secretary of State Chapter 170 | |
2016-05-31 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Returned from House |
2016-05-21 | House | Bill was passed vote: 125-0 |
2016-05-21 | House | Third reading |
2016-05-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 21, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-09 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-05 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2772 |
2016-05-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-0 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2772 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed