MN SF235 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - HF substituted in committee HF15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Voluntary relationship defense for criminal sexual conduct crimes elimination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary relationship defense for criminal sexual conduct crimes elimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateHF substituted in committee HF15
2019-02-28SenateAuthor added Hoffman
2019-02-28SenateAuthor stricken Dziedzic
2019-02-27SenateChief author added Benson
2019-02-27SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Bigham
2019-02-27SenateAuthor stricken Pappas
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-01-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF15 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 16 05/02/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback