MN HF15 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 16 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 16 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Voluntary relationship defense for criminal sexual conduct crimes eliminated.
Title
Voluntary relationship defense for criminal sexual conduct crimes eliminated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: H.F. NO. 15 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Secretary of State Chapter 16 05/02/2019 | |
2019-05-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-02 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-02 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-02 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-05-01 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2019-04-30 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Bernardy |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-02-21 | House | Third reading |
2019-02-21 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 21st, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-06 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-01-30 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-14 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF235 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - HF substituted in committee HF15