MN SF2341 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Osteopathic physicians licensure requirement modification; board of medical practice composition technical changes establishment
Title
Osteopathic physicians licensure requirement modification; board of medical practice composition technical changes establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2445 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with HF2445 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2445 (Similar To) 2016-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 119 05/19/16