MN SF234 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Housing and Homelessness Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Housing and Homelessness Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing infrastructure grants pilot program and appropriation
Title
Housing infrastructure grants pilot program and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Author added Rasmusson |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2124 (Similar To) 2023-02-21 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy