MN SF2126 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deafblind persons intervener services provisions modification
Title
Deafblind persons intervener services provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1983 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1983 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 23 05/15/2019