MN SF2102 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crookston regional charitable food distribution, warehouse, and office facility grant bond issue and appropriation
Title
Crookston regional charitable food distribution, warehouse, and office facility grant bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. LeRoy Stumpf [D] | Sen. Rod Skoe [D] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Authors added Skoe; Ingebrigtsen |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2220 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance