MN SF2099 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Political contributions from funds subject to the individual income tax requirement
Title
Political contributions from funds subject to the individual income tax requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Cohen [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Zachary Dorholt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-06 | House | Second reading |
2014-05-06 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2463 |
2014-05-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 37-23 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |