MN SF2090 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - Third reading Failed to pass vote: 28-35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - Third reading Failed to pass vote: 28-35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State procurement of outside contracts restrictions removal and repeal
Title
State procurement of outside contracts restrictions removal and repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Senate | Third reading Failed to pass vote: 28-35 |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF2090&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=SF2090&version=0&session=ls87 |