MN SF2076 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 167 04/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 167 04/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dakota county local government plan adoption
Title
Dakota county local government plan adoption
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Sieben [D] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. James Metzen [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Tara Mack [R] | Rep. Mary Liz Holberg [R] | Rep. Anna Wills [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 109 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Secretary of State Chapter 167 04/25/14 | |
2014-04-28 | Governor's action Approval 04/25/14 | |
2014-04-25 | Governor approval | |
2014-04-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill was passed vote: 109-18 |
2014-04-22 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-22 | House | Amendments offered |
2014-04-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 22, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-02 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2474 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 50-16 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |