MN SF2003 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Authors added Dziedzic; Bigham
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Authors added Dziedzic; Bigham
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes motivated by bias reporting expansion; crimes of assault, property damage and harassment motivated by bias modification; Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training update of training in recognizing, responding to, and reporting crimes of bias requirement; appropriating money
Title
Crimes motivated by bias reporting expansion; crimes of assault, property damage and harassment motivated by bias modification; Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training update of training in recognizing, responding to, and reporting crimes of bias requirement; appropriating money
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Authors added Dziedzic; Bigham |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Author added Hawj |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Chief author added Latz |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Pappas |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1691 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Author added Winkler