MN HF1691 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Winkler
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Winkler
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes motivated by bias reporting expanded; crimes of assault, property damage, and harassment motivated by bias amended; Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training required to update training in recognizing, responding to, and reporting bias crimes; and money appropriated.
Title
Crimes motivated by bias reporting expanded; crimes of assault, property damage, and harassment motivated by bias amended; Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training required to update training in recognizing, responding to, and reporting bias crimes; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Winkler |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Fischer and Howard |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2022-02-14 | House | Author changed Vang (made chief author) |
2021-05-03 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-04-22 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-17 | House | Author added Noor |
2021-04-12 | House | Author added Greenman |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Gomez |
2021-04-06 | House | Authors added Moller and Bierman |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-25 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Schultz, Reyer, Freiberg, Stephenson, Berg, Her, and Huot |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-22 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; Lee; Hollins; Xiong, J.; Jordan; Agbaje; Frazier; Pryor; Acomb; Edelson; Lippert and Vang |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Pinto |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2003 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Authors added Dziedzic; Bigham