MN SF2002 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Rest
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Rest
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Census employees multiunit residential facilities access requirement and appropriation
Title
Census employees multiunit residential facilities access requirement and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. James Carlson [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Carolyn Laine [D] |
Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Authors added Cwodzinski; Dibble; Laine |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1644 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division