MN HF1644 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
United States Census employee access to multiunit residential facilities required, Census 2020 Mobilization Partnership program established, encouraging participation in 2020 federal census outreach initiatives funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
United States Census employee access to multiunit residential facilities required, Census 2020 Mobilization Partnership program established, encouraging participation in 2020 federal census outreach initiatives funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Andrew Carlson [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Dehn, Bahner, and Sauke |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Vang |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2002 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Author added Rest