MN SF200 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment providing for gender equality under the law
Title
Constitutional amendment providing for gender equality under the law
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Cohen [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. James Carlson [D] |
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Author stricken Jensen |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Author stricken Nelson |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Author stricken Rosen |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF13 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy