MN HF13 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Gender equality provided for under the law, and constitutional amendment proposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender equality provided for under the law, and constitutional amendment proposed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 52 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-03-11SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-11SenateReceived from House
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Youakim
2019-03-07HouseBill was passed
2019-03-07HouseThird reading
2019-03-07HouseAmendments offered
2019-03-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSecond reading
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-27HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
2019-02-25HouseAuthors added Bernardy and Hausman
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Her
2019-02-20HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-07HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-01-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Brand, Sandell, Huot, Noor, and Masin
2019-01-22HouseAuthors added Moller and Kotyza-Witthuhn
2019-01-14HouseAuthors added Halverson, Ecklund, Lee, Schultz, Mariani, Dehn and Sauke
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF200 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0013&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF13&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF13&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=60
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=61
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=62
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=63
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0013&session_number=0&year=2019&id=64

Bill Comments

feedback