MN SF1808 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Carlson
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Carlson
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ujamaa Place appropriation
Title
Ujamaa Place appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Author added Murphy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF612 (Similar To) 2021-02-01 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy