MN SF1766 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Senate: Author added Sheran
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Senate: Author added Sheran
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State-county chemical health care home pilot project
Title
State-county chemical health care home pilot project
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Berglin [D] | Sen. Dick Day [R] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Senate: Author added Sheran | |
2009-03-26 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance | |
2009-03-25 | Senate: Withdrawn and re-referred to Health, Housing and Family Security | |
2009-03-24 | Senate: Author added Day | |
2009-03-23 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-23 | Senate: Referred to Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=Senate&f=SF1766&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/data/senate/bills/ls86/1700/S1766.0.pdf |