MN SF1760 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Conciliation court claims jurisdictional limit modification by increasing the monetary value of claims authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conciliation court claims jurisdictional limit modification by increasing the monetary value of claims authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateSecond reading
2024-02-29SenateComm report: To pass
2023-03-15SenateSecond reading
2023-03-15SenateComm report: To pass
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-02-16SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2189 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback