MN SF1747 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unfilled government agency positions appropriation reduction authorization
Title
Unfilled government agency positions appropriation reduction authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1920 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Authors added Bahr and Munson