MN SF1711 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Finance Authority bond issue and appropriation
Title
Rural Finance Authority bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Bill Lieske [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Chief author added Lang |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Johnson |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Author added Lieske |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF103 (Similar To) 2023-01-25 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment