MN SF1711 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle sales and distribution regulation
Title
Motor vehicle sales and distribution regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-06 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-04 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Presentment date | |
2009-04-30 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2009-04-29 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-04-29 | House: Third reading | |
2009-04-28 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-04-24 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-24 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2009-04-23 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1717 | |
2009-04-23 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-20 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |