MN SF1698 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vivian Act
Title
Vivian Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Author added Coleman |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2421 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Authors added Hollins, Moller, Stephenson and Edelson