MN SF1698 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - HF substituted on General Orders HF518
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - HF substituted on General Orders HF518
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State aid road program rulemaking authority modification; over-dimension motor vehicle permit provisions modification; bridge inspection and signing account establishment; water permitting process for transportation projects requirement
Title
State aid road program rulemaking authority modification; over-dimension motor vehicle permit provisions modification; bridge inspection and signing account establishment; water permitting process for transportation projects requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF518 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Author added Reinert |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |