MN SF1676 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Title
Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |