MN SF16 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Author stricken Schoen
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Author stricken Schoen
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote
Title
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Author stricken Schoen |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Author added Schoen |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF845 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Author added Fischer.