MN HF845 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote enacted.
Title
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote enacted.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-02-09 | House | Authors added Carlson, L., and Flanagan. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF16 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Author stricken Schoen