MN SF1598 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Digital Fair Repair Act
Title
Digital Fair Repair Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Author stricken Koran |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1337 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Author added Pursell