MN SF156 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Government units definition inclusion of service cooperatives for joint exercise of powers purposes
Title
Government units definition inclusion of service cooperatives for joint exercise of powers purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF33 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division