MN HF33 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Service cooperatives included in governmental units definition for joint powers purposes.
Title
Service cooperatives included in governmental units definition for joint powers purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Marquart |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF156 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Second reading