MN SF155 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Automatic sprinkler system installation requirement in certain existing public housing buildings requirement
Title
Automatic sprinkler system installation requirement in certain existing public housing buildings requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF109 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy