MN SF1539 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Sparks
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community development for greater Minnesota program establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community development for greater Minnesota program establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateAuthor added Sparks
2019-03-07SenateAuthor added Eken
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
2019-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1553 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Author added Haley

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback