MN HF1553 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Greater Minnesota community design and economic development statewide resource created, and money appropriated.
Title
Greater Minnesota community design and economic development statewide resource created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Haley |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1539 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Author added Simonson