MN SF1527 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - HF substituted on Calendar HF1926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - HF substituted on Calendar HF1926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial feed and feed ingredients voluntary good manufacturing practices certificate establishment
Title
Commercial feed and feed ingredients voluntary good manufacturing practices certificate establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Doug Magnus [R] | Sen. David Hann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Senate | HF substituted on Calendar HF1926 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | General Orders: To pass |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Author added Hann |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Economies |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF1527&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=SF1527&version=0&session=ls87 |