MN SF1522 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary technicians, the practice of veterinary technology and unlicensed veterinary employees regulation
Title
Veterinary technicians, the practice of veterinary technology and unlicensed veterinary employees regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Author added Rasmusson |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1228 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Author added Wiens