MN SF1470 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - House conferees Hausman; Howard; Theis
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - House conferees Hausman; Howard; Theis
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Executive Order 20-79 nullification; landlord and tenant law gubernatorial modifications prohibition; phaseout of the eviction moratorium authorization; tenants with pending rental assistance applications eviction actions prohibition
Title
Executive Order 20-79 nullification; landlord and tenant law gubernatorial modifications prohibition; phaseout of the eviction moratorium authorization; tenants with pending rental assistance applications eviction actions prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | House conferees Hausman; Howard; Theis |
2021-05-11 | House | House conferees Hausman, Howard, Theis |
2021-05-11 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate conferees Draheim, Duckworth, Dziedzic |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate conferees Draheim; Duckworth; Dziedzic |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Taken from table |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended |
2021-04-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2106 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Author added Pfarr