MN SF1459 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales reporting requirement for intermediate blend of gasoline and biofuel
Title
Sales reporting requirement for intermediate blend of gasoline and biofuel
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1266 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy