MN SF1445 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF1745
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF1745
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Speech language pathologists, occupational therapists and licensed health care professional provisions modifications; health department resident reimbursement classification implementation; food, beverage and lodging establishments licensure provisions modifications
Title
Speech language pathologists, occupational therapists and licensed health care professional provisions modifications; health department resident reimbursement classification implementation; food, beverage and lodging establishments licensure provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Senate: HF substituted on General Orders HF1745 | |
2009-04-30 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-30 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-26 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-03-12 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-12 | Senate: Referred to Health, Housing and Family Security |