MN SF1414 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Sparks
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Sparks
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Beginning farmer rentals of agricultural assets and financial management programs income tax credit authorization
Title
Beginning farmer rentals of agricultural assets and financial management programs income tax credit authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Goggin [R] | Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Author added Sparks |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF608 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Author added Kiel.